MD SB839 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the confidentiality, under specified circumstances, of information that an insurer files with the Maryland Insurance Commissioner as proprietary rate-related information; requiring the Commissioner, if the Commissioner makes a specified determination, to give an insurer specified notice of a determination and to make specified material open to specified public inspections; requiring the People's Insurance Counsel Division to maintain the confidentiality of specified proprietary rate-related information; etc.
Title
Insurance - Rate Filings - Trade Secrets
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2016-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (133-0) |
2016-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {373798/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2016-04-04 | House | Rereferred to Economic Matters |
2016-03-28 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Feldman) {563426/1 Adopted |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Special Order until 3/24 (Senator Feldman) Adopted |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Special Order until 3/23 (Senator Feldman) Adopted |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {987772/1 |
2016-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Attorney General
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Disclosure
Housing
Inspections
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Law Enforcement
Medical Malpractice
Notices
Prices
Privacy
Subpoenas
Time
Trade Secrets
Attorney General
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Disclosure
Housing
Inspections
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Law Enforcement
Medical Malpractice
Notices
Prices
Privacy
Subpoenas
Time
Trade Secrets