MD SB839 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-29 - Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-29 - Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to endorse and promote competency-based postsecondary education as an important component of Maryland's higher education system; requiring the Commission to develop and execute, in cooperation with Western Governors University (WGU), Excelsior College, and other comparable nonprofit institutions, a binding memorandum of understanding that supports and endorses analyzing and taking steps to reduce and remove specified obstacles; etc.
Title
College Affordability and Innovation Act of 2012
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs Withdrawn | |
2012-02-22 | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-22 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-03 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Codes
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Examinations
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Interstate Affairs
Licenses
Nonprofit Organizations
Nurses
Publications
Reports
State Universities and Colleges
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Examinations
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Interstate Affairs
Licenses
Nonprofit Organizations
Nurses
Publications
Reports
State Universities and Colleges
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/SB0839.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/sb/sb0839f.pdf |