MD SB838 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1094

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-03 - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring an election judge to establish a voter's identity by requiring the voter to present certain proof of identity; requiring the election judge to read the voter's name aloud; requiring a voter to vote a provisional ballot if the voter is unable to provide certain proof of identity; and prohibiting a person from knowingly and willfully voting or attempting to vote under a false form of identification.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Law – Polling Places – Proof of Identity

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-03SenateHearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-03-03SenateHearing canceled
2021-02-12SenateHearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-02-09SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Same As/Similar To

HB1094 (Carry Over) 2014-02-27 - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Election Law10310(n/a)See Bill Text
Election Law16201(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback