MD SB835 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 561
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 561
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a local health department or county government to which the Department of the Environment has delegated authority to administer a septic and well program to submit, on or before December 1, 2024, a schedule of review times for certain well and septic program permits for approval; and requiring a local health department or county government to submit well and septic program permit data to the Department for review beginning 3 months after the original schedule submission approved by the Department and every 3 months thereafter.
Title
Environment - Delegated Authorities - Well and Septic Program Permits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 118 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 118 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 561 |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2024-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (118-18) |
2024-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments {783528/1 Adopted |
2024-04-01 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-03-25 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-25 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-21 | House | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-08 | House | Referred Environment and Transportation |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {803724/1 Adopted |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
Same As/Similar To
HB992 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 562
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Health
permits
Reports
Sewage
studies
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Wells
Counties
Environment
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Health
permits
Reports
Sewage
studies
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Wells
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 9 | 1114 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |