MD SB835 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a lender from maintaining an action to foreclose a mortgage or deed of trust on residential property in the State for a specified period of time; requiring the Office of the Attorney General to study, evaluate, and make recommendations regarding specified foreclosure alternatives and report its findings to the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2016; and providing for the termination of specified provisions of the Act.
Title
Real Property - Foreclosure Moratorium and Study (Foreclosure Relief Act of 2015)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2015-02-23 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Attorney General
Banks and Trust Companies
Deeds
Financial Institutions
Foreclosure
Loans
Mortgages
Real Property
Reports
Sunset
Banks and Trust Companies
Deeds
Financial Institutions
Foreclosure
Loans
Mortgages
Real Property
Reports
Sunset