MD SB830 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 12 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Secretary of Health, in consultation with the State Department of Education and other stakeholders, to develop certain guidelines for school-based health centers; requiring the Governor to transfer the administration of school-based health center grants from the State Department of Education to the Bureau of Maternal and Child Health within the Maryland Department of Health on or before July 1, 2022; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Secretary of Health - School-Based Health Centers - Guidelines and Administration of Grants

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12SenateReturned Passed
2021-04-10HouseThird Reading Passed (97-36)
2021-04-09HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-04-09HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2021-03-20HouseReferred Health and Government Operations Ways and Means
2021-03-19SenateThird Reading Passed (44-1)
2021-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed
2021-03-18SenateFavorable Adopted
2021-03-18SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2021-02-11SenateHearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2021-02-09SenateFirst Reading Finance

Same As/Similar To

HB1148 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-30 - Returned Passed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health - General1922A-01(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General19-22A01(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General19-22A2(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General19-22A3(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General19-22A4(n/a)See Bill Text
Health - General19-22A5(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback