MD SB830 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 200
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 200
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the date by which, in a case of child abuse, a specified claimant may file a claim with the Criminal Injuries Compensation Board.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Criminal Injuries Compensation Board - Child Abuse Victims
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 200 |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2014-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2014-04-01 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-26 | House | Rereferred to Judiciary |
2014-03-20 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Child Abuse and Neglect
Claims
Committees and Commissions
Criminal Injuries Compensation
Criminal Law - Procedure
Statutes of Limitation
Victims
Claims
Committees and Commissions
Criminal Injuries Compensation
Criminal Law - Procedure
Statutes of Limitation
Victims