MD SB828 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 208
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 208
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing certain survivor benefits to certain surviving children of certain members of the State Retirement and Pension System; providing for the payment of a certain allowance to surviving children of a member when there is no surviving spouse; providing for the distribution of a certain allowance to surviving children; allowing certain surviving children to participate in the State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits program; etc.
Title
Employees', Teachers', and Correctional Officers' Systems - Active Members - Death Benefits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 208 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2019-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2019-04-03 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-04-02 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {549733/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 8:30 a.m. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/28 at 9:00 a.m. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Age of Majority
Beneficiaries
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Correctional Officers
Death
Disabilities
Evidence
Minors
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Public Employees
Spouses
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Teachers
Vital Records
Welfare
Beneficiaries
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Correctional Officers
Death
Disabilities
Evidence
Minors
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Public Employees
Spouses
State Employees
State Pensions and Retirement
Teachers
Vital Records
Welfare