MD SB828 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the requirements for a specified disclosure that a licensee of the State Real Estate Commission must make under specified circumstances; establishing a specified exception to a specified disclosure requirement; establishing specified exceptions to the time when a specified disclosure must occur; requiring the Commission to prepare and provide a specified required notice; requiring a subagent to make a specified required disclosure under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Real Estate Brokers - Agency Relationships in Residential Real Estate Transactions - Disclosure and Consent Requirements
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-27 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2016-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2016-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2016-03-17 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {634137/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Business Regulation and Occupations
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Disclosure
Licenses
Notices
Privacy
Real Estate
Real Property
Business Regulation and Occupations
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Disclosure
Licenses
Notices
Privacy
Real Estate
Real Property