MD SB821 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 406
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 406
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a certain condition under which the Board of License Commissioners of Garrett County may issue a certain alcoholic beverages license to a hotel or motel; authorizing a gift basket permit holder to purchase certain alcoholic beverages from a wholesaler; authorizing a holder of a Class C multiple day beer license, beer and wine license, or beer, wine, and liquor license to hold another license that is issued by the Board; etc.
Title
Garrett County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2023
Sponsors
Sen. Mike McKay [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 406 |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2023-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2023-04-10 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-10 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2023-03-13 | House | Referred Economic Matters |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB905 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 407
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Garrett County
Gifts
Hotels and Motels
License Commissioners, Boards of
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Garrett County
Gifts
Hotels and Motels
License Commissioners, Boards of
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 21 | 1001.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 21 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 21 | 1309 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 21 | 1310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 21 | 2006 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 21 | 2201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 21 | 2202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 21 | 902 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |