MD SB821 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-26 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 802
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Community Development Program in the Department of Housing and Community Development; establishing the Community Development Board in the Program; establishing the Community Development Fund to provide financial assistance to community development projects and community development organizations around the State; requiring the Board to report on the activities of the Fund to the Governor and the General Assembly by December 31 each year; providing for the construction of the Act; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community Development Program Act of 2018

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (90-50) (Y: 91 N: 51 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (35-11) (Y: 36 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-26SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 802
2017-12-08SenateReturned Passed
2018-04-09HouseThird Reading Passed (90-50)
2018-04-05HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-05HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-05HouseFavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2018-03-20HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2018-03-19SenateThird Reading Passed (35-11)
2018-03-15SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-15SenateFavorable with Amendments {584634/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-14SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-02-27SenateHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-05SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback