MD SB82 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Renaming the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to be the Maryland Department of Health; renaming the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to be the Secretary of Health; providing that the Maryland Department of Health is the successor of the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene; providing that specified names and titles of a specified unit and officials in laws and other documents mean the names and titles of the successor unit and officials; etc.
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Renaming
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 214 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2017-03-24 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-24 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-24 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2017-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-25 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {777478/1 Report Adopted |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Hearing 1/17 at 11:00 a.m. |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2016-11-02 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Annotated Code of Maryland
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Legislative Services, Department of
Names
Notices
Public Health
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Annotated Code of Maryland
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Legislative Services, Department of
Names
Notices
Public Health
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials