MD SB815 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting specified work release and prerelease programs in Montgomery County from specified prohibitions relating to telecommunication devices in a place of confinement.
Title
Criminal Law - Telecommunication Devices in Place of Confinement - Montgomery County Work Release and Prerelease Programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (123-14) (Y: 123 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197 |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (123-14) |
2014-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-02 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-02 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2014-03-27 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Correctional Institutions
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Montgomery County
Prisoners
Public Safety
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Montgomery County
Prisoners
Public Safety
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones