MD SB810 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-23 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-23 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to develop and implement a specified transfer agreement for students who earn an associate of science degree in dental hygiene or medical laboratory technology at an institution of higher education that has received a certificate of approval to operate in the State whereby at least 60 credits earned as part of the degree are transferable to a public senior higher education institution in the State for credit towards a bachelor's degree; etc.
Title
Higher Education - Programs in Dental Hygiene and Medical Laboratory Technology - Transfer of Students and Senatorial and Delegate Scholarships
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-02-20 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Dental Hygienists
Health Occupations
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Laboratories
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Health Occupations
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Laboratories
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
State Universities and Colleges
Students