MD SB81 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 516
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 516
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain principal departments of the Executive Branch to develop, annually update, and submit to the Maryland Emergency Management Agency (MEMA) continuity of operations plans to address the impact of a certain emergency or crisis; requiring certain continuity of operations plans to include certain information; requiring MEMA to develop certain guidelines and to serve as a coordinating agency; stating the intent of the General Assembly that MEMA implement certain provisions of law with existing personnel and resources; etc.
Title
State Government - Emergency Management - Continuity Planning
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 516 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-15 | House | Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m. |
2020-03-15 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-31 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {174130/1 Adopted |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-01-02 | Senate | Hearing 1/15 at 3:00 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Communications
Disclosure
Emergencies
Emergency Services
Examinations
Governor
Job Training
Military Department
Public Officials
Public Safety
Records
Reports
State Employees
Work, Labor and Employment
Communications
Disclosure
Emergencies
Emergency Services
Examinations
Governor
Job Training
Military Department
Public Officials
Public Safety
Records
Reports
State Employees
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Safety | 14 | 116 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |