MD SB81 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 50
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 50
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting certain feminine hygiene products from the sales and use tax.
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Hygienic Aids - Exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 50 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-03-27 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-27 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-26 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2018-03-21 | House | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-06 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {689739/1 Report Adopted |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Hearing 1/18 at 2:30 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2017-09-21 | Senate | Pre-filed |