MD SB81 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the June 30, 2016, termination date of provisions of law authorizing the Department of Juvenile Services to transfer a child committed to residential placement from one facility to another facility under specified circumstances.
Title
Juvenile Law - Continuum of Care - Repeal of Termination Date
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m. |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Hearing 1/21 at 2:00 p.m. |
2016-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Child Custody
Courts
Hearings
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Facilities
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Notices
Sunset
Courts
Hearings
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Facilities
Juvenile Law
Juvenile Services, Department of
Notices
Sunset