MD SB81 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-14 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-14 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to prescribe different qualifications for judges of the Orphans' Court for Baltimore County; requiring judges of the Orphans' Court for Baltimore County to have been admitted to practice law in the State and be members in good standing of the Maryland Bar; and submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection.
Title
Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - Qualifications
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings Withdrawn | |
2012-02-06 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-01-18 | Hearing 2/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-16 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/SB0081.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/sb/sb0081f.pdf |