MD SB81 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a requirement that the Maryland Higher Education Commission and the Department of Human Resources identify, promote, and coordinate specified efforts and services and undertake specified activities at institutions of higher education related to recipients of Family Investment Program services; etc.
Title
Higher Education - Assistance Efforts for Family Investment Program Recipients
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-11 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2011-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-01 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | |
2011-03-23 | Hearing 3/29 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-23 | Hearing cancelled | |
2011-03-16 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-11 | First Reading Appropriations | |
2011-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-11 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2011-03-09 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-09 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-08 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2011-01-26 | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-20 | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Human Resources, Department of
Mentors
Reports
Social Services
Students
Volunteers
Welfare
Higher Education Commission
Human Resources, Department of
Mentors
Reports
Social Services
Students
Volunteers
Welfare