MD SB809 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 552
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 552
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Comptroller to distribute specified abandoned property funds each year to the Maryland Legal Services Corporation Fund, rather than to the Maryland Legal Services Corporation; increasing from $500,000 to $1,500,000 the amount that the Comptroller is required to distribute; repealing provisions requiring the Governor to appropriate money each year to the Maryland Legal Services Corporation Fund; etc.
Title
Maryland Legal Services Corporation Funding - Abandoned Property Funds
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Frosh [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-06 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (122-13) (Y: 122 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (126-11) (Y: 126 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (122-13) (Y: 122 N: 13 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-29 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (126-11) (Y: 126 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 552 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2013-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (122-13) |
2013-04-08 | House | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2013-04-08 | House | Delegates Guzzone, Zucker, and McConkey |
2013-04-08 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2013-04-08 | House | House Refuses to Recede |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Senators Frosh, Gladden, and Getty |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Senate Requests House Recede |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments |
2013-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (126-11) |
2013-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments {574266/1 Report Adopted |
2013-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2013-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-26 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {648973/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Abandoned Property
Appropriations
Comptroller
Corporations
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Legal Aid
Revenue and Taxes
Appropriations
Comptroller
Corporations
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Legal Aid
Revenue and Taxes