MD SB809 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-5)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-15 - Hearing 3/19 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-15 - Hearing 3/19 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designating specified periods each year to be tax-free periods during which an exemption from the sales and use tax is provided for the sale of specified textbooks purchased by a full-time or part-time student enrolled at a public senior higher education institution or regional higher education center; etc.
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College Textbooks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-15 | Hearing 3/19 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-14 | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-09 | Re-assigned Budget and Taxation | |
2012-02-03 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/SB0809.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/sb/sb0809f.pdf |