MD SB806 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 700
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 700
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a Naturopathic Doctors Formulary Council within the State Board of Physicians; requiring the Council to develop and recommend to the Board a specified formulary to include nonprescription drugs and devices, prescription oxygen and auto-injectable epinephrine and specified contraceptive devices; requiring the Council to provide specified reviews of the formulary, and make specified recommendations to the Board; requiring the Board to adopt a specified formulary; etc.
Title
State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors - Establishment of Naturopathic Doctors Formulary Council and Naturopathic Formulary
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-28 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 700 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2016-04-09 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-09 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-09 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2016-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-10 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {844737/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Dentists
Drugs
Emergencies
Equipment
Health
Health Occupations
Licenses
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Physicians
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Dentists
Drugs
Emergencies
Equipment
Health
Health Occupations
Licenses
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Physicians