MD SB800 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-10 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-10 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Public Service Commission to include on its staff a certain number of experts in cybersecurity to perform certain duties; requiring the Commission to establish, in coordination with the Office of Security Management, cybersecurity standards and best practices for regulated entities, share information on cybersecurity initiatives and best practices with certain entities, collect certain certifications, and submit a certain report; requiring each public service company to report a cybersecurity incident to certain entities; etc.
Title
Public Service Commission - Cybersecurity Staffing and Assessments (Critical Infrastructure Cybersecurity Act of 2023)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 40 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-10 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (40-7) |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {283427/1 Adopted |
2023-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/07 at 1:30 p.m. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |
Same As/Similar To
HB969 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 499
Subjects
Certifications
Cybersecurity
Emergency Management, Department of
Information Technology, Department of
Job Training
Public Service Commission
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Standards and Best Practices
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Weights and Measures
Work, Labor, and Employment
Cybersecurity
Emergency Management, Department of
Information Technology, Department of
Job Training
Public Service Commission
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Standards and Best Practices
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Weights and Measures
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Corporations and Associations | 5 | 637 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 1 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 2 | 108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 2 | 113 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 5 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 5 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |