MD SB800 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 677
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 677
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Inmate Training and Job Pilot Program at certain institutions of postsecondary education to provide educational and vocational training opportunities for inmates in the 12 months preceding the inmate's date of release; requiring the Pilot Program to be administered by the Maryland Higher Education Commission and the governing entity of each institution; requiring the Division of Corrections and the Commission to develop a hybrid virtual and in-person learning environment in the system by June 1, 2022; etc.
Title
Inmate Training and Job Act of 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 104 N: 32 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 677 |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (104-32) |
2021-04-10 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-09 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2021-03-23 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-03-20 | House | Referred Judiciary |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Floor Amendment {473220/1 (Senator Patterson) Adopted |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {564831/1 Adopted |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ferguson) Adopted |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {564831/1 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Motion Laid Over (Senator Cassilly) Adopted |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {564831/1 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB1337 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-24 - Hearing 3/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Subjects
Age of Majority
Appropriations
Budgets
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Correction, Division of
Counselors
Education
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Housing
Licenses
Mentors
Nonprofit Organizations
Prisoners
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Sunset
Telephones
Time
Virtual Environments
Work, Labor, and Employment
Appropriations
Budgets
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Correction, Division of
Counselors
Education
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Housing
Licenses
Mentors
Nonprofit Organizations
Prisoners
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
State Universities and Colleges
Students
Sunset
Telephones
Time
Virtual Environments
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Correctional Services | 3 | 611 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 24 | 1301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 24 | 1302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 24 | 1303 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 24 | 1304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 24 | 1305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 24 | 1306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |