MD SB8 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the State song.
Title
General Provisions – State Song – Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - Floor Amendment 373127/1 (Delegate Shoemaker) Rejected (Y: 43 N: 89 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - Floor Amendment 373127/1 (Delegate Shoemaker) Rejected (Y: 43 N: 89 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2021-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149 |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2021-03-29 | House | Third Reading Passed (95-38) |
2021-03-29 | House | Floor Amendment {373127/1 (Delegate Shoemaker) Rejected (43-89) |
2021-03-25 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-24 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2021-03-20 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-08-04 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB667 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 148
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
General Provisions | 7 | 318 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 7 | 319 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |