MD SB8 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 36
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 36
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring specified carriers to maintain a risk management framework for specified purposes; requiring specified carriers or specified insurance groups to conduct an own risk and solvency assessment regularly or at any time when there are significant changes to the carrier's or insurance group's risk profile; requiring specified carriers to submit to the Maryland Insurance Commissioner a specified report or reports on request or if the Commissioner is the lead state commissioner of a specified insurance group; etc.
Title
Insurance - Risk Management and Own Risk and Solvency Assessment Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 36 |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2017-03-30 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0) |
2017-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-29 | House | Favorable with Amendments {763791/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-29 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2017-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-17 | House | Hearing canceled |
2017-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-24 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {277270/1 Report Adopted |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2016-09-22 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Assessments
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Contracts
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Contracts
Insurance
Insurance - Other than Health
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Reports
Rules and Regulations