MD SB8 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 327
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 327
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the due date for specified payment of deferred county property taxes in Anne Arundel County if the owner no longer satisfies specified income eligibility requirements; and making clarifying changes to provisions of law that require payment of specified deferred county property taxes under specified circumstances.
Title
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Deferrals - Payment Due Date
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 327 |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2016-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-06 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-06 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2016-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-25 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2015-07-13 | Senate | Pre-filed |