MD SB8 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 161
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 161
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing a gas company to recover costs associated with infrastructure replacement projects through a gas infrastructure replacement surcharge on customer bills; requiring project cost calculations to include specified elements; specifying how the pretax rate of return is calculated and adjusted and what it includes; stating that the intent of the General Assembly is to accelerate infrastructure improvements by establishing a mechanism for gas companies to recover reasonable and prudent costs of infrastructure replacement; etc.
Title
Gas Companies - Rate Regulation - Infrastructure Replacement Surcharge
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (116-19) (Y: 116 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (34-13) (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Rosapepe) {163725/1 Rejected (19-21) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Madaleno) {293726/1 Rejected (15-29) (Y: 15 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Favorable with Amendments Adopted (31-12) (Y: 31 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Special Order until 2/5 (Brochin) Rejected (21-22) (Y: 21 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2012-02-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (34-13) (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Rosapepe) {163725/1 Rejected (19-21) (Y: 19 N: 21 NV: 5 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-02-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Madaleno) {293726/1 Rejected (15-29) (Y: 15 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Favorable with Amendments Adopted (31-12) (Y: 31 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Special Order until 2/5 (Brochin) Rejected (21-22) (Y: 21 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 161 |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-02-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (116-19) |
2013-02-19 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-02-19 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-02-18 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2013-02-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (34-13) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Rosapepe) {163725/1 Rejected (19-21) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Madaleno) {293726/1 Rejected (15-29) |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Special Order until 2/5 (Senator Middleton) Adopted |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted (31-12) |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 2/5 (Senator Brochin) Rejected (21-22) |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2013-02-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {867177/1 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Astle) Adopted |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {867177/1 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Hearing 1/23 at 2:30 p.m. |
2013-01-09 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2012-09-18 | Senate | Pre-filed |