MD SB8 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a warrant official to certify to the Comptroller the existence of an outstanding warrant; providing that the Comptroller may not pay Maryland income tax refunds to individuals with outstanding warrants under specified circumstances; providing that the requirement applies only to residents of Anne Arundel County or individuals with warrants from Anne Arundel County; requiring the Comptroller to withhold and pay required amounts under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refund - Anne Arundel County - Warrants
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (135-1) | |
2012-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | |
2012-03-22 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-15 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2012-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2012-02-14 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-02-10 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-02-10 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-02-09 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2012-01-18 | Hearing 2/1 at 3:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-11 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | |
2011-09-07 | Pre-filed |