MD SB799 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 902
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 902
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the State Board of Dental Examiners to waive certain education requirements for certain applicants for a limited license to practice dentistry who provide dental services for adults.
Title
Health Occupations – Limited License to Practice Dentistry – Services for Adults
Sponsors
Sen. Mike McKay [R] | Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 902 |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-03-29 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2024-03-27 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-27 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-27 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-03-25 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:30 p.m. |
2024-03-25 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-15 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {923429/1 Adopted |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB786 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 901
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 4 | 303.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 4 | 308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |