MD SB797 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 261
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 261
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing, from $200,000 to $500,000 beginning in fiscal year 2024, the amount of an appropriation that the Governor is required to provide in the annual budget bill for the CASH Campaign of Maryland.
Title
Human Services - CASH Campaign - Annual Appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Guy Guzzone [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 100 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 261 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2022-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (100-32) |
2022-04-05 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2022-03-29 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-23 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-18 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB447 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 260
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Human Services | 6 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |