MD SB790 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 187
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 187
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying that a person who has charge or custody of an animal and who unnecessarily fails to provide the animal with proper air, proper space, proper shelter, or proper protection from the weather is guilty of violating a specified prohibition against abuse or neglect of an animal; and clarifying that a person who intentionally mutilates, intentionally tortures, intentionally cruelly beats, or intentionally cruelly kills an animal is guilty of violating a specified prohibition against aggravated cruelty to animals.
Title
Criminal Law - Animal Cruelty - Applicability
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-1) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 187 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-1) |
2017-03-31 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-31 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2017-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-06 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |