MD SB790 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 72
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Passed on April 8 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 72
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to develop and make available a specified form for enrollees to use to request confidential communications from health insurance carriers in accordance with specified provisions of federal law; requiring carriers to accept a specified form for a specified purpose under specified circumstances; providing that a notice given by an insurer under specified circumstances is subject to specified provisions of federal law; making the Act an emergency measure; etc.
Title
Health Insurance - Communications Between Carriers and Enrollees - Conformity With the Health Insurance Portability and Accountability Act (HIPAA)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 72 |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2014-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-04-01 | House | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-28 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2014-03-20 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {677574/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Claims
Emergency Bills
Federal Government
Forms
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance - Health
Insurance Administration
Notices
Patients
Privacy
Emergency Bills
Federal Government
Forms
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance - Health
Insurance Administration
Notices
Patients
Privacy