MD SB787 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting reducing or terminating temporary cash assistance for certain individuals under certain circumstances; prohibiting reducing or terminating temporary cash assistance for certain individuals because of good cause as determined by the Secretary of Human Services; requiring local departments of social services to provide a conciliatory period of 30 days to certain individuals who are not in compliance with the Family Investment Program; requiring 25% of funding be withheld upon certain acts of noncompliance; etc.
Title
Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Eligibility
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {487178/1 Adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 12:00 p.m. (Finance) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Hearing canceled (Finance) |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance and Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HB1313 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 457
Subjects
Child Care
Counties
Disabilities
Domestic Violence
Education
Eviction
Exemptions
Foreclosure
Health
Human Services, Department of
Indigent Persons
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Penalties and Sentences
Pregnancy
Social Services
Social Services - Generally
Support of Dependents
Time
Transportation
Utilities
Welfare
Work, Labor and Employment
Counties
Disabilities
Domestic Violence
Education
Eviction
Exemptions
Foreclosure
Health
Human Services, Department of
Indigent Persons
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Penalties and Sentences
Pregnancy
Social Services
Social Services - Generally
Support of Dependents
Time
Transportation
Utilities
Welfare
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Human Services | 5 | 308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 5 | 309 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 5 | 310 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Human Services | 5 | 312 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |