MD SB781 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-04 - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-04 - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing pharmacists to substitute biosimilar biological products for prescribed biological reference products only under specified circumstances; requiring pharmacists or their designees to give specified notices and record specified information if the pharmacist substitutes an interchangeable biosimilar biological product for a prescribed biological reference product; etc.
Title
Pharmacists - Biosimilar Biological Products - Substitutions
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-1) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-04 | House | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-13 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-1) |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {124936/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |