MD SB778 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving Vehicles; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to make specified determinations, review specified information, consider specified issues, and make specified recommendations related to the use of self-driving vehicles; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2017; etc.
Title
Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving Vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2015-02-18 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Accidents
Committees and Commissions
Driver Education
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Reports
Sunset
Transportation, Department of
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous
Committees and Commissions
Driver Education
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Reports
Sunset
Transportation, Department of
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous