MD SB774 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 546
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 546
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax in the amount of $3,500 for qualifying members of the Maryland Civil Air Patrol, subject to specified conditions; providing for a delayed effective date; etc.
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Maryland Civil Air Patrol
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Mathias [D] | Sen. J.B. Jennings [R] | Sen. Katherine Klausmeier [D] | Sen. Bryan Simonaire [R] |
Sen. Ronald Young [D] | Sen. Verna Jones-Rodwell [D] | Sen. Nathaniel McFadden [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (132-0) (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 546 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2013-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2013-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-05 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2013-04-04 | House | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-04-02 | House | Rereferred to Ways and Means |
2013-03-26 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {289037/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:15 p.m. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Aircraft
Emergency Medical Services
Exemptions
Fire Protection
Income Tax
Records
Reports
Rescue Squads
Taxes - Income
Volunteers
Emergency Medical Services
Exemptions
Fire Protection
Income Tax
Records
Reports
Rescue Squads
Taxes - Income
Volunteers