MD SB771 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Referred Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency to conduct a certain study on the use of proceeds from certain gambling activities; requiring the Agency to report its findings to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2020; providing for the termination of the Act; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency - Gaming Study - Use of Gaming Proceeds

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17HouseReferred Ways and Means
2020-03-16SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2020-03-16SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-16SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-16SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2020-02-10SenateHearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-10SenateHearing canceled
2020-02-06SenateHearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m.
2020-02-03SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback