MD SB768 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-06 - Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, on or before October 1, 2021, minimum mandatory standards for inmate food services to comply with certain health and wellness standards adopted by the Secretary of Health; requiring certain training standards adopted by the Secretary of Public Safety and Correctional Services to include certain standards for health care workers; requiring the Secretary of Health to adopt dietary standards for certain health facilities on or before October 1, 2021, that comply with certain health and wellness standards; etc.
Title
Health - Health and Wellness Standards - Correctional Facilities and Health Care Facilities
Sponsors
Sen. Obie Patterson [D] | Sen. Clarence Lam [D] | Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Michael Hough [R] |
Sen. Susan Lee [D] | Sen. Douglas Peters [D] | Sen. Mary Washington [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-06 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 12:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB819 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Boundaries
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Correctional Institutions
Demographics
Diseases
Education
Electronic Communication
Ethics
Examinations
Food
Gender
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Medical Schools
Medical Treatments
Prerelease and Reentry
Prices
Prisoners
Public Health
Public Information
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Reports
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Women
Boundaries
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Correctional Institutions
Demographics
Diseases
Education
Electronic Communication
Ethics
Examinations
Food
Gender
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Medical Schools
Medical Treatments
Prerelease and Reentry
Prices
Prisoners
Public Health
Public Information
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Reports
Residency
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Women
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Correctional Services | 8 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 19 | 308 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 21 | 1301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 21 | 1302 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0768?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb0768f.pdf |