MD SB768 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifying that a license issued by another state to an individual to carry a regulated firearm, including a concealed regulated firearm, is valid in Maryland.
Title
Regulated Firearms - License Issued by Another State - Reciprocity
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-31 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |