MD SB768 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-08 - Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-08 - Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to adopt regulations requiring that classroom instruction for the driver education program include a video course of a specified duration that pertains to organ, eye, and tissue donation in the State and becoming an organ, eye, or tissue donor; and requiring the video course to be completed in the classroom.
Title
Organ Donation Driver Education Act of 2013
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-3) (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-04-02 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-22 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-3) |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {228076/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Pipkin) Adopted |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {228076/1 |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Driver Education
Motor Vehicle Administration
Nonprofit Organizations
Organ Donorship
Rules and Regulations
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Video
Motor Vehicle Administration
Nonprofit Organizations
Organ Donorship
Rules and Regulations
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Video