MD SB767 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-04 - Re-referred Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-04 - Re-referred Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that specified wind energy conversion systems comply with specified setback requirements; authorizing specified variances under specified circumstances; requiring that before a permit is issued for specified wind energy conversion systems, the Garrett County Department of Planning and Land Development retain a specified professional engineer to prepare a specified cost estimate and require the applicant to post a specified bond; requiring that the bond be held as surety for specified purposes; etc.
Title
Garrett County - County Commissioners - Wind Energy Conversion Systems
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-23 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Re-referred Economic Matters | |
2012-03-25 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2012-03-23 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-22 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-22 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-26 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2012-02-27 | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-03 | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Alternative Energy Sources
Bonds
Emergency Bills
Energy Matters
Garrett County
Laws and Ordinances
Licenses
Power Plants
Reclamation
Sunset
Zoning and Planning
Bonds
Emergency Bills
Energy Matters
Garrett County
Laws and Ordinances
Licenses
Power Plants
Reclamation
Sunset
Zoning and Planning