MD SB765 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Public Service Commission to convene a workgroup to study and make recommendations on developing a mechanism to allow specified tenants to pay for utilities when the landlord responsible for utility payments defaults on the responsibility; requiring the Public Service Commission to report findings and recommendations to the Senate Finance Committee and the House Economic Matters Committee on or before December 1, 2012; etc.
Title
Public Service Commission - Study on Tenant Payment of Landlord Utility Bills
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 121 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (121-15) | |
2012-04-04 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-09 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-04-06 | Re-referred Economic Matters & Environmental Matters | |
2012-03-30 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2012-04-06 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-28 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | |
2012-03-27 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-27 | Favorable with Amendments 817878/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2012-02-23 | Hearing 3/6 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-03 | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Eviction
Fees
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Liability
Notices
Public Service Commission
Reports
Utilities
Eviction
Fees
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Liability
Notices
Public Service Commission
Reports
Utilities