MD SB764 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 472
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 472
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the calculation of certain income tax disparity grants to counties and Baltimore City under certain circumstances and for certain fiscal years; and extending a certain termination provision by 2 years.
Title
Local Governments - Income Tax Disparity Grants - Amounts
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Mathias [D] | Sen. Ulysses Currie [D] | Sen. Adelaide Eckardt [R] | Sen. Stephen Hershey [R] |
Sen. Nathaniel McFadden [D] | Sen. Douglas Peters [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-4) (Y: 135 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 472 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-4) |
2018-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-07 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2018-03-28 | House | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-20 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {999236/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Counties
Grants
Income Tax
Local Government - Generally
Sunset
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local
Counties
Grants
Income Tax
Local Government - Generally
Sunset
Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local