MD SB764 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the State Lottery and Gaming Control Commission from taking any action on or after July 1, 2015, that would affect the amount of proceeds from video lottery terminals paid to the State unless the General Assembly approves the action through legislation enacted into law.
Title
Video Lottery Terminals - Changes Affecting Proceeds - Legislative Approval
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2015-02-16 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |