MD SB764 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 614
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 614
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Arts Incubator Workgroup to study how arts and cultural institutions can support local artists; and requiring the Workgroup to submit to the Governor and the General Assembly a preliminary report on its findings, including research, case studies, and examples of approaches used to support artists in other areas, by January 1, 2025, and a final report on its recommendations, including any necessary budget, facilities, or in-kind services that are needed or could be used to support local artists, by October 1, 2025.
Title
Arts Incubator Workgroup - Established
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 614 |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2024-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-9) |
2024-03-29 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-29 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-29 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2024-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-20 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-20 | House | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-16 | House | Referred Appropriations |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Floor Amendment {463628/1 (Senator Hayes) Adopted |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/13 (Senator A. Washington) Adopted |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Favorable |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/11 (Senator Hayes) Adopted |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Favorable |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-01 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB1451 (Crossfiled) 2024-05-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 613
Subjects
Art, Music, and Cultural Affairs
Committees and Commissions
Demographics
Economic Development
Education
Reports
Sunset
Committees and Commissions
Demographics
Economic Development
Education
Reports
Sunset