MD SB763 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an employer that collects voluntary contributions from employees through payroll deduction to a campaign finance entity selected by the employer to record the address of each contributor and transfer that information to the campaign finance entity; etc.
Title
Election Law - Payroll Deductions and Member Contributions - Address of
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 104 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-27 | Third Reading Passed (104-32) | |
2012-03-26 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-26 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | |
2012-03-26 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-19 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2012-03-27 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-19 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | |
2012-03-17 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-17 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-19 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-02-15 | Hearing 3/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-03 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |