MD SB763 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding a specified exemption from the requirement to obtain a hunting license for a person who serves in the armed forces and has a service-connected disability.
Title
Hunting Licenses - Exemption for Disabled Armed Forces Members
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (136-1) | |
2011-04-02 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-02 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2011-03-22 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-17 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2011-04-04 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-16 | Third Reading Passed (46-1) | |
2011-03-14 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-14 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-11 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 3/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-04 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |