MD SB763 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-08 - Unfavorable Report by Finance Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-08 - Unfavorable Report by Finance Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definitions of "basic cost of cigarettes" and "cost to the wholesaler" in the Cigarette Sales Below Cost Act.
Title
Commercial Law - Sale of Cigarettes - Cost
Sponsors
Sen. John Astle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Unfavorable Report by Finance Withdrawn | |
2010-03-02 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-02-24 | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-10 | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/SB0763.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/sb/sb0763f.pdf |