MD SB762 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB509
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-14 - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-14 - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the prohibition against a person using or possessing with intent to use, delivering or selling under certain circumstances, or manufacturing or possessing with intent to deliver or sell under certain circumstances drug paraphernalia to inject, ingest, inhale, or otherwise introduce into the human body a controlled dangerous substance; altering a prohibition against a person possessing or distributing controlled paraphernalia under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Drug Paraphernalia for Administration - Decriminalization
Sponsors
Sen. Jill Carter [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB173 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-03 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
SB509 (Carry Over) 2022-01-31 - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
SB509 (Carry Over) 2022-01-31 - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Equipment
Penalties and Sentences
Transfer of Goods
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Equipment
Penalties and Sentences
Transfer of Goods
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 5 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 5 | 619 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 5 | 620 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |